The Estate of Laura Wickliffe v. Target Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Laura Wickliffe
Defendant: Target, Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation and Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00046
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 28 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #26 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, filed by Gavin M. Richard the scheduling conference set for 3/31/2022 is CANCELED. No status report is due at this time. The court will reset the scheduling conference to a later date upon resolution of the Motion to Withdraw. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE AND ORDER: The #26 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, filed by Gavin M. Richard is set for a hearing on Thursday, March 31, 2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom. Participant instructions are attached. The appearance of Plaintiff The Estate of Laura Wickliffe (Derrick Woods and Jamie Wickliffe) and Gavin M. Richard, are required at the hearing. Counsel of record for Plaintiff The Estate of Laura Wickliffe (Derrick Woods and Jamie Wickliffe) shall advise them of this Order and provide the participant instructions. Any party or counsel who does not have video web conferencing capabilities must contact the Court at (225) 389-3584 immediately to make other arrangements. Failure to attend the scheduled hearing may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/22/2022. (BLR)
March 16, 2022 Filing 26 Second MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Ex Parte by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Withdrawing Attorney's Affidavit Per Rule 83, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1A)(Richard, Gavin)
March 16, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #26 Second MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Ex Parte. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice the #24 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record ("Motion") for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(13). The Motion does not contain a certification by counsel that the client has been notified of all deadlines and pending court appearances. Additionally, the Certificate of Service appears to be for a "Memorandum in Opposition" not the said Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 7, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 First MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 5, 2022 Filing 24 First MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Of Record by The Estate of Laura Wickliffe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order For Motion to Withdraw)(Richard, Gavin)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The #22 Defendants' Consent Motion for Leave to Appear at the Scheduling Conference Via Telephone is GRANTED for good cause shown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scheduling Conference, if needed, is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/4/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
March 4, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear At The Scheduling Conference Via Telephone by Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie)
March 4, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF Designation Of Lead Attorney For Defendants by Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation (Kamps, Julie)
March 4, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear At The Scheduling Conference Via Telephone . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
March 1, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended And Supplemental Complaint by Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kamps, Julie)
February 15, 2022 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation, filed by The Estate of Laura Wickliffe.(LLH)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint, filed by Plaintiff The Estate of Laura Wickliffe. The [16-1] proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint seeks to clarify that Plaintiff is asserting an ERISA claim, which was one of the asserted grounds for removal of the case. R. Doc. 1, pp. 2-3. The Motion was timely filed and Defendants have no objection the amendment. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the [16-1] First Amended and Supplemental Complaint, which will become the operative complaint for Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/15/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Petition for Damages (R. Doc. 15) is hereby STRICKEN from the record. Plaintiff has subsequently filed a #16 Motion to Amend Original Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/15/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint by The Estate of Laura Wickliffe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; FIRST AND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Order)(Richard, Gavin) Modified to edit text on 2/15/2022 (BLR).
February 15, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR)
February 14, 2022 Filing 15 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Petition for Damages by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Order)(Richard, Gavin) Modified to edit text on 2/15/2022 (BLR). Modified on 2/16/2022 to remove document as it has been stricken by Order # 17 (LLH).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Alnisa Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting #13 Motion for Julie Kamps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/7/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 4, 2022 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Julie Kamps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2392116) by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion For Admission of Visiting Attorney Julie Kamps, #2 Exhibit - Order For Admission of Visiting Attorney Julie Kamps)(Wynne, Alia)
February 4, 2022 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Alnisa Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2392089) by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - In Support of Motion For Admission of Visiting Attorney Alnisa Bell, #2 Exhibit - Order For Admission of Visiting Attorney Alnisa Bell)(Wynne, Alia)
February 4, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Ex Parte MOTION for Alnisa Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2392089), #13 Ex Parte MOTION for Julie Kamps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2392116). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Wynne, Alia)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Substitute Record Document No. 1, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, to correct the caption. The Clerk of Court is instructed to substitute the [8-1, pp. 2-9] amended Notice of Removal for the #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/31/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
January 31, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Substitute Record Document No. 1 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Defendant Target Corporation. The Motion, which seeks a twenty-one days extension to respond to Plaintiff's Petition, states that it is unopposed. Additionally, the requirements for an extension under Local Civil Rule 7(a) are met. Defendant Target Corporation's responsive pleadings to the Petition for Damages (R. Doc. 1-2, pp. 5-6) due 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/29/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
January 29, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Or Otherwise Respond. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EWD)
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Record Document No. 1 by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (Notice of Removal Revised Case Caption), #2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Wynne, Alia)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Or Otherwise Respond by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wynne, Alia)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF Appearance of Alia Wynne On Behalf of Target Corporation by Target Corporation (Wynne, Alia)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America under Local Civil Rule 7(a). Responsive pleadings for The Prudential Insurance Company of America to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages (R. Doc. 1-2, pp. 5-6) due 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/27/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wynne, Alia)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/25/2022. (ELW)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC.. (Wynne, Alia)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Parish of East Baton Rouge 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-714449. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2387227), filed by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Wynne, Alia) Modified on 2/1/2022 to substitute notice of removal as per Order #10 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Laura Wickliffe v. Target Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Laura Wickliffe
Represented By: Gavin Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Alia S. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Julie Melissa Kamps
Represented By: Alia S. Wynne
Represented By: Alnisa Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Julie Melissa Kamps
Represented By: Alia S. Wynne
Represented By: Alnisa Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?