Amiblu Technology AS v. U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC
Plaintiff: AMIBLU TECHNOLOGY AS
Defendant: U.S. COMPOSITE PIPE SOUTH, LLC and Ken M. Thompson, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00259
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amiblu Technology AS. Ken M. Thompson, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Stevens, Gregory)
May 25, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Supplemental, Amended, and Restated Complaint for Declaratory Judgment in compliance with the Court's Order of May 11, 2022 at R. Doc 14) against Ken M. Thompson, LLC, U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC, filed by Amiblu Technology AS.(Stevens, Gregory)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On or before May 25, 2022, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the complete citizenship of defendant U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Brief due by 5/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 05/11/2022. (ELW)
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Submitted as to U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC (Stevens, Gregory)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Amiblu Technology AS as to U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC. (Stevens, Gregory)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Submitted as to U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC (Stevens, Gregory)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ken M. Thompson, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Submitted as to Ken M. Thompson, LLC f/k/a U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC (Stevens, Gregory)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC, Ken M. Thompson, LLC, filed by Amiblu Technology AS.(Stevens, Gregory)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 6/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/29/2022. (SGO)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 SEALED Motion for Leave to File to File Exhibit Under Seal Under Seal. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 4/21/2022. (JEG)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (JEG)
April 21, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Ex Parte SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Under Seal by AMIBLU TECHNOLOGY AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Exhibit to be Filed Under Seal, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Stevens, Gregory)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against U.S. COMPOSITE PIPE SOUTH, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2419749.), filed by AMIBLU TECHNOLOGY AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons)(Stevens, Gregory) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/21/2022) (JEG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2022: #4 Sealed Attachment A) (JEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amiblu Technology AS v. U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. COMPOSITE PIPE SOUTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken M. Thompson, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMIBLU TECHNOLOGY AS
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Alfred Paul LeBlanc, Jr.
Represented By: Warner Joseph Delaune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?