Ieyoub et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Richard Ieyoub and Caprice Brown Ieyoub
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00279
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
2 Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Whitlow, Sharon)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Chassaignac, Charles)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 6/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/10/2022. (SGO)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company is granted an extension of time until 5/27/2022 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/5/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Chassaignac, Charles)
May 4, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Chassaignac, Charles)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-717068. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2423194), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Record and Service Documents, #2 Exhibit B Demand, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Chassaignac, Charles) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/2/2022) (EDC). Modified on 5/2/2022 to rotate pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ieyoub et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ieyoub
Represented By: Sharon Starkey Whitlow
Represented By: Adrian Dante Toranto
Represented By: Stephen Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caprice Brown Ieyoub
Represented By: Sharon Starkey Whitlow
Represented By: Adrian Dante Toranto
Represented By: Stephen Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Represented By: Eleanor Weeks Wall
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Represented By: Kennedy Maya Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?