Delmore v. Warden at EHCC et al
Petitioner: Damon Delmore
Respondent: Warden at EHCC and Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2022cv00433
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 31749. (EDC)
July 11, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Damon Delmore (NLT)
July 1, 2022 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Damon Delmore. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to E)(NLT)
June 29, 2022 Filing 2 Letter dated 06/25/2022 from Damon Delmore to Clerk of Court Re: 2254 (NLT)
June 28, 2022 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Damon Delmore.(NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delmore v. Warden at EHCC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damon Delmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden at EHCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?