United States of America et al v. PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P.
Plaintiff: United States of America and Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality
Defendant: PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00468
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901 Resource & Recovery Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 9/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/5/2022.(SGO)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jane Borthwick Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/29/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration.
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 Exhibit(s) to #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Jane Borthwick Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2455232) by PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exh. B - Declaration of Story)(Bremer, Bryant)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. (JEG)
July 28, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Jane Borthwick Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2455232). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Jane Borthwick Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2455232) by PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bremer, Bryant)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Enroll Counsel. Attorney Bryant Robert Bremer is enrolled as counsel for Defendant PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/18/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 15, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Enroll Bryant R. Bremer as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
July 14, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by United States of America identifying Affiliate/Interested Person PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P., Affiliate/Interested Person United States of America, Affiliate/Interested Person PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer Operations, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality for United States of America. (Rhorer, Davis) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/15/2022 to flatten the image) (NLT).
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 Additional Exhibits to #2 Notice of (other),,, by United States of America. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appx. 2, Attachment B: Permanent Closure Plan)(Rhorer, Davis)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Enroll Bryant R. Bremer as Attorney by PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bremer, Bryant)
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF Lodging of Consent Decree by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appx. 1, Attachment A, #4 Appx. 1, Attachment B, #5 Appx. 1, Attachment C, #6 Appx. 1, Attachment D, #7 Appx. 1, Attachment E, #8 Appx. 1, Attachment F, #9 Appx. 1, Attachment G, #10 Appendix 2, #11 Appx. 2 Text, #12 Appx. 2, Attachment A, #13 Appx. 2, Att. B, p. 1 of 6, #14 Appx. 2, Att. B, p. 2 of 6, #15 Appx. 2, Att. B, p. 3 of 6, #16 Appx. 2, Att. B, p. 4 of 6, #17 Appx. 2, Att. B, p. 5 of 6, #18 Appx. 2, Att. B, p. 6 of 6, #19 Appx. 2, Att. B, Instructions and Exh. 1-3, #20 Appx. 2, Attachment C, #21 Appx. 2, Attachment D, #22 Appx. 2, Attachment E, #23 Appendix 3, #24 Appendix 4)(Rhorer, Davis) Modified on 7/14/2022 to edit the text (NLT).
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rhorer, Davis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Davis Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality
Represented By: Davis Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P.
Represented By: Bryant Robert Bremer
Represented By: Jane Borthwick Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?