Anding v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Anding
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company, Ruan Transport Corporation, Carl A. Greer and Ruan Logistics Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00627
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Partial Dismissal. Dismissing RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION, without prejudice, reserving any and all claims and causes of action against the remaining Defendants herein. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/08/2022. (ELW)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for November 10, 2022 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2023. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 11/10/2022. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 3/3/2023. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 4/3/2023. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/31/2023. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/31/2023. Discovery from Experts due by 12/15/2023. Motions shall be filed by 2/15/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2024 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/19/2024. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 7/29/2024. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 8/19/2024. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2024 - 9/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/8/2022. (SGO)
November 7, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Defendant, Ruan Logistics Corporation, by Curtis Anding (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order for Partial Dismissal)(Zimmerman, Richard)
November 3, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruan Transport Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ruan Transportation Management Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent Ruan Financial Corporation for Ruan Transport Corporation. (Breaux, Ralph)
November 3, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Ace American Insurance Company, Carl A. Greer.(Breaux, Ralph)
November 3, 2022 Filing 16 Answer to Petition and ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Ruan Transport Corporation.(Breaux, Ralph)
November 2, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Ace American Insurance Company, Carl A. Greer, Ruan Logistics Corporation, Ruan Transport Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ace American Insurance Company, Carl A. Greer, Ruan Logistics Corporation, Ruan Transport Corporation, filed by Curtis Anding.(LLH)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Leave to File (Renewed) First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Curtis Anding. The Clerk's Office shall enter Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amending Complaint (R. Doc. 12-2) into the record. It is Plaintiff's responsibility to serve the new defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/2/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 2, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave to File (Renewed) First Supplemental and Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File (Renewed) First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Curtis Anding (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; First Supplemenetal and Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons - Greer, #4 Exhibit Summons - Ruan Transport, #5 Exhibit Summons - Ruan Logistics Corp, #6 Exhibit Summons - Ace American Ins)(Zimmerman, Richard) (Attachments 3 through 6 replaced on 11/2/2022) (ELW). Modified on 11/2/2022 to flatten documents (ELW).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #6 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a renewed motion with an attached proposed pleading identifying the state of incorporation and principal place of business of the proposed defendant Ruan Transport Corporation. The renewed motion shall also indicate whether the current Defendants oppose the relief sought. The Clerk's Office shall modify the docket to reflect that Ruan Logistics Corporation is a current defendant (as opposed to the proposed defendant Ruan Transport Corporation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/31/2022. (LLH)
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Curtis Anding. (Zimmerman, Richard)
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Ace American Insurance Company. (Breaux, Ralph)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace American Insurance Company, Carl A. Greer.(Breaux, Ralph)
October 19, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Amend MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
September 28, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Curtis Anding (Zimmerman, Richard) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/29/2022) (ELW). Modified on 9/29/2022 to flatten document (ELW).
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Curtis Anding (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exh 1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Exh 2 Supplemental and Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Exh 3 Summons Ace American, #4 Summons Exh 4 Summons Greer, #5 Summons Exhibit 5 Summons Ruan Logistics, #6 Summons Exht 6 Summons Ruan Transport)(Zimmerman, Richard) Modified on 9/28/2022 to edit text (ELW) (Attachment 3-6 replaced on 9/29/2022) (ELW). Modified on 9/29/2022 to flatten documents (ELW).
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 10/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2022. (SGO)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting in part #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Local Rule 7(a) provides for a 21 day extension of time. Defendants Carl A. Greer, Ruan Transport Corporation, and ACE American Insurance Company are granted a 21 day extension from the date answers were due to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/19/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
September 14, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Ace American Insurance Company, Carl A. Greer, Ruan Transport Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Breaux, Ralph)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ace American Insurance Company, Carl A. Greer, Ruan Transport Corporation identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Carl A. Greer for Carl A. Greer; Affiliate/Interested Person Ruan Transport Corporation for Ruan Transport Corporation; Affiliate/Interested Person Ace American Insurance Company for Ace American Insurance Company.. (Breaux, Ralph)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 721887. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2475780), filed by Carl A. Greer, Ruan Transport Corporation, Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Petition, #3 Exhibit B-process, #4 Verification, #5 Certificate of Filing of State Court Record, #6 Exhibit 1-State Court Record)(Breaux, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anding v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Anding
Represented By: Richard F. Zimmerman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Ralph Gerard Breaux
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Cory Thomas Stuart
Represented By: Kristopher Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruan Transport Corporation
Represented By: Ralph Gerard Breaux
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Cory Thomas Stuart
Represented By: Kristopher Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl A. Greer
Represented By: Ralph Gerard Breaux
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Cory Thomas Stuart
Represented By: Kristopher Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruan Logistics Corporation
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Cory Thomas Stuart
Represented By: Kristopher Gould
Represented By: Ralph Gerard Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?