McGraw v. Dominguez et al
Plaintiff: Katy Lynne McGraw
Defendant: Maria Dominguez and The Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00672
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (LLH)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving #8 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims in this matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and with each party to bear its own costs and expenses. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/31/2022. (KDC)
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Maria Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffith-Braud, Monica)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/18/2022. (KAH)
October 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Maria Dominguez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Declaration of Seth Rowland)(Griffith-Braud, Monica)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF Civil Cover Sheet by Maria Dominguez (Griffith-Braud, Monica)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Substitution of Defendant by Maria Dominguez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffith-Braud, Monica) Modified on 9/23/2022 to edit text. (EDC). Modified on 9/23/2022 to edit text.(EDC).
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Maria Dominguez identifying Corporate Parent The Hertz Corporation, Corporate Parent The United States Attorney's Office, Corporate Parent Welborn & Hargett, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person The United States of America, Affiliate/Interested Person Katy Lynne McGraw, Affiliate/Interested Person Maria Dominguez, Affiliate/Interested Person Jason Welborn, Affiliate/Interested Person U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for Maria Dominguez. (Griffith-Braud, Monica)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana, Case Number C-722319. (), filed by Maria Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certification of Scope of Employment, #3 Exhibit B-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit B-2 - State Court Petition and Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit B-3 - Request for Notice, #6 Exhibit B-4 - Citation and Service Documents)(Griffith-Braud, Monica) (Attachments 3-6 replaced on 9/23/2022) (EDC). Modified on 9/23/2022 to rotate pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGraw v. Dominguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katy Lynne McGraw
Represented By: Jason M. Welborn
Represented By: Jacob H. Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Dominguez
Represented By: Monica Griffith-Braud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?