Ardoin v. Williams, et al
Defendant: Marsha Ardoin, Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc., Russia Williams and HUB International Midwest Limited doing business as HUB International Gulf South
Case Number: 3:2022cv00865
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HUB International Midwest Limited, Russia Williams.(Gray, Sophie)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The #11 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant HUB International Midwest Limited is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is instructed to strike Record Document 10 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 7, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 10 Certificate of Interested Persons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUB International Midwest Limited identifying Corporate Parent HUB International Limited, Corporate Parent Hockey Intermediate Inc., Corporate Parent Hockey Parent Inc., Corporate Parent Hockey Parent Holdings LP, Corporate Parent HUB International U.S. Holdings Inc. for HUB International Midwest Limited. (Gray, Sophie)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by HUB International Midwest Limited identifying Corporate Parent, Corporate Parent HUB International Limited, Corporate Parent Hockey Intermediate Inc., Corporate Parent Hockey Parent Inc., Corporate Parent Hockey Parent Holdings LP, Corporate Parent HUB International U.S. Holdings Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Phelps Dunbar LLP, Affiliate/Interested Person Phelps Dunbar LLP for HUB International Midwest Limited.. (Gray, Sophie)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 10 Certificate of Interested Persons, by HUB International Midwest Limited (Gray, Sophie)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUB International Midwest Limited identifying Corporate Parent HUB International Limited, Corporate Parent HUB International Holdings, Corporate Parent Hockey Intermediate Inc., Corporate Parent Hockey Parent Inc., Corporate Parent Hockey Parent Holdings LP for HUB International Midwest Limited. (Gray, Sophie) Modified on 12/7/2022 to edit title of document.(JEG). Modified on 12/8/2022 to remove document as it has been stricken by Order #14 (LLH).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Because the requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(a) are met, the #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Defendants Russia Williams and HUB International Midwest Limited d/b/a HUB International Gulf South is GRANTED. Because Rule 7(a) provides only for extensions of twenty-one days, these two Defendants now have until December 23, 2022, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/5/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG)
December 5, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) Modified on 12/5/2022 to edit docket text (JEG).
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by HUB International Midwest Limited, Russia Williams (Attachments: #1 Order)(Gray, Sophie) Modified on 12/5/2022 to edit title of document (JEG).
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company for Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Chapoton, Douglas) Modified on 12/2/2022 to edit name of corporate parent (JEG).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 2/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/14/2022. (KAH)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Petition and Breach of Contract by Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Chapoton, Douglas) Modified on 11/9/2022 to edit title of document. (JEG).
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company; Affiliate/Interested Person Industrial Fabrics Inc for Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Chapoton, Douglas) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/9/2022 to flatten document) (JEG). Modified on 11/9/2022 to edit name of corporate parent(JEG).
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Notice of Removal. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-723918 Div. 32. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2500398), filed by Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages and Breach of Contract, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Chapoton, Douglas) Modified on 11/7/2022 to edit State Court information. (JEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ardoin v. Williams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Ardoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern National Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas M. Chapoton
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Represented By: Erica Schirling Aguillard
Represented By: Jessica Wainwright Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russia Williams
Represented By: Chris K. Ralston
Represented By: Sophie Marie Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUB International Midwest Limited doing business as HUB International Gulf South
Represented By: Chris K. Ralston
Represented By: Sophie Marie Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?