Phillips v. Javeler Marine Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PHILLIP PHILLIPS
Defendant: JAVELER MARINE SERVICES, LLC, EXON MOBIL CORPORATION and Exxon Mobil Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00907
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #19 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (ELW)
January 13, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Javeler Marine Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sunland Capital, LLC for Javeler Marine Services, LLC. (Brackett, Alan)
January 12, 2023 Filing 18 Letter to Attorney Alan G Brackett regarding Alex J. Domingue who is Co-Counsel for party Defendant. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (ELW)
January 12, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Bienvenu, David)
January 12, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Bienvenu, David)
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #14 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (ELW)
January 12, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons by Javeler Marine Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sunland Capital, LLC for Javeler Marine Services, LLC. (Brackett, Alan)
January 11, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Javeler Marine Services, LLC.(Brackett, Alan)
December 12, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Exxon Mobil Corporation identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Welborn & Hargett, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Phillip Phillips, Affiliate/Interested Person Javeler Marine Services, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco & Viator, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Exxon Mobil Corporation for Exxon Mobil Corporation.. (Bienvenu, David) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/13/2022) (ELW). Modified on 12/13/2022 to flatten document (ELW).
December 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #9 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (LLH)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion and Order for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint for good cause shown. Exxon Mobil Corporation responsive pleadings due 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/9/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 9, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR)
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Bienvenu, David) Modified on 12/12/2022 to flatten and replace document (LLH).
December 8, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Bienvenu, David)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/29/2022. (BLR)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Phillips. Exxon Mobil Corporation served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Hargett, Jacob)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Phillips. Javeler Marine Services, LLC served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Hargett, Jacob)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Exxon Mobil Corporation, Javeler Marine Services, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Phillip Phillips identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Welborn & Hargett, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Phillip Phillips, Affiliate/Interested Person Javeler Marine Services, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Exxon Mobil Corporation for Phillip Phillips. (Welborn, Jason) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/22/2022) (EDC). Modified on 11/22/2022 to flatten document. (EDC).
November 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (BLR)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2506830.), filed by PHILLIP PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Pleading; Request for Notice, #3 Attachment Summons in a Civil Action, #4 Attachment Summons in a Civil Action)(Welborn, Jason) (Attachments 1, 3-4 replaced on 11/22/2022) (EDC). Modified on 11/22/2022 to flatten documents. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Javeler Marine Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP PHILLIPS
Represented By: Jason M. Welborn
Represented By: Jacob H. Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAVELER MARINE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Alan G. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?