Scott v. Sweat
Plaintiff: Jimmy Scott
Defendant: William Sweat
Case Number: 3:2023cv00199
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 32274 (ELW)
March 17, 2023 Filing 3 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2023. Filing Fee due by 4/7/2023. Statement of Account due by 4/7/2023. (ELW)
March 15, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ., ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Sweat (NLT)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Sweat, filed by Jimmy Scott.(NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Sweat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sweat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?