In Re: Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana
Respondent: Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana
In Re: Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2023cv00365
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Zachary D. Rosenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2604547) by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Rosenbaum Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(LaHaye, Luke)
July 10, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leif T. Simonson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2604544) by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Simonson Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(LaHaye, Luke)
July 10, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY in Support of #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 filed by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Rosenbaum Declaration, #2 Exhibit - Rohregger Declaration)(LaHaye, Luke)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time and for Leave to File Reply in Excess of Page Limit filed by B&C KB Holding GmbH ("B&C") for good cause shown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for B&C to file areply in support of its application for an order to take discovery pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 is extended by one week or until July 10, 2023, and that B&C is permitted it to exceed the page limit by five to seven pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/3/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 30, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 MOTION for Leave to File Excess of Page Limit. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
June 29, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 for Leave to File Excess of Page Limit by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(LaHaye, Luke). Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 6/30/2023 (JEG). Modified on 6/30/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
June 26, 2023 Filing 14 Exhibit(s) to #12 Memorandum in Opposition to, by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TRSL 2022 Report, #2 Exhibit US - Austria MLAT, #3 Exhibit Austrian Criminal Code Section 20, #4 Exhibit Austrian Code of Criminal Procedure Sections 55, 64-67, 443, #5 Exhibit Louisiana TRS Attorney Declaration)(Johnson, Kristie)
June 21, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #12 Memorandum in Opposition. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. Each exhibit MUST include a description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). (JEG)
June 19, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Johnson, Kristie)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document. The clerk is directed to strike R. Doc. 2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/8/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 7, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana re #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 (LaHaye, Luke)
June 7, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, #7 Certificate of Service by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(LaHaye, Luke)
June 7, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 Certificate of Service . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
June 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #7 Certificate of Service. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (JEG)
June 5, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana (LaHaye, Luke) Modified on 6/6/2023 to edit title of document (JEG).
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 KB Holding GmbH's Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782. Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana's deadline to file a response to B&C KB Holding GmbH's application is extended until June 19,2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/5/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 5, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
June 2, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 by All Defendants (Johnson, Kristie)
May 15, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana identifying Corporate Parent B&C Holding sterreich GmbH, Corporate Parent B&C Privatstiftung, Affiliate/Interested Person Wolfgang Hofer, Affiliate/Interested Person Erich Hampel, Affiliate/Interested Person Birgit Noggler for Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana. (LaHaye, Luke)
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to 2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (JEG) Modified on 5/15/2023 to edit text (JEG).
May 12, 2023 Filing 2 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Certificate of Interested Persons by Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana identifying Corporate Parent B&C Holding Osterreich GmbH for Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana. (LaHaye, Luke) Modified on 5/15/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG). Modified on 6/9/2023 to remove document as it has been stricken per Order #11 (LLH).
May 12, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION/Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 by B&C KB Holding GmbH (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Zimpfer Declaration, #5 Exhibit Rohregger Declaration, #6 Exhibit Rosenbaum Declaration, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(LaHaye, Luke) Modified on 5/12/2023 to edit the text (NLT).
May 12, 2023 Notice of Payment of $402.00 Initial Filing Fee by B&C KB Holding GmbH. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ALAMDC-2581033. (LaHaye, Luke)
May 12, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #1 MOTION /Application for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
May 12, 2023 Case assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Matter of the Application of B&C KB Holding GMBH for an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 from the Teachers Retirement System of Louisiana
Represented By: Mark Raymond Beebe
Represented By: Luke Gerard LaHaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana
Represented By: Kristie E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?