Nelson v. Alleman
Plaintiff: Michael Nelson
Defendant: Rhonda Alleman, Mike Caze, WBR Sheriff Dept., WBT Council, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance, Louisiana Department of Corrections and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2023cv00504
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rhonda Alleman, Mike Caze, WBR Sheriff Dept., WBT Council, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance, Louisiana Department of Corrections, State of Louisiana, filed by Michael Nelson.(NLT)
August 3, 2023 Filing 14 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. (JEG)
August 2, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Expand the Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
August 1, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Expand the Record by Michael Nelson (NLT)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULING AND ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/31/2023. (JEG)
July 27, 2023 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: ZoomStatus Conference held on 7/27/2023 at 3:00 PM CST. Status of matter discussed. Because Plaintiff has failed to satisfy the elements required for an order granting injunctive relief, his motion for a preliminary injunction will be denied, and this matter will proceed in the normal course. An order denying the motion shall issue. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EAB)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 Return on #8 Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (US Marshal, )
July 24, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Defendant's Position Taken to Justify Denying the Plaintiff's Constitutional Rights filed by Michael Nelson. (NLT)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference before the District Judge set for 7/27/2023 at 03:00 PM in by video before Judge Brian A. Jackson. The Warden of WBR Jail, or their designee shall produce Plaintiff, Michael Nelson (#053923), in the video conferencing facilities at WBR Jail. The Clerk of Court shall immediately serve a copy of this Order and Copies of the Original pro se Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction upon Jason Wixom, Jacob G. Longman, Kathryn Jakuback Burke, and Jeanna Wheat by email. An attorney from the Longman Jakuback law firm shall appear at the video status conference. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/24/2023. (JEG)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Zoom Status Conference held before Judge Brian A. Jackson on July 20, 2023 at 3:30 PM. Status of matter discussed. The status conference is RESET for July 27, 2023 at 3:00p.m. via Zoom. An order setting the Zoom conference shall issue. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Stewart, Jesse)
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 Return on #5 Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (US Marshal, )
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: A video status conference be and is hereby SET for Thursday, July 20, 2023, at 3:30 p.m. to select a hearing date and related deadline. The W arden of WBR Jail, or their designee shall produce Plaintiff, Michael Nelson (#053923), in the video conferencing facilities at WBR Jail at 3:15 p.m. on Thursday, July 20, 2023, for the video status conference. Status Conference before the District Judge set for 7/20/2023 at 03:00 PM in by video before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/17/2023. (ELW)
July 14, 2023 Filing 4 Statement of Account by Michael Nelson. (NLT)
June 29, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ., ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT)
June 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Nelson (NLT)
June 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Nelson (NLT)
June 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rhonda Alleman, filed by Michael Nelson.(NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Alleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Alleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Caze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WBR Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WBT Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?