Ricks v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Defendant: Department of Justice, Louisiana State Bar Association, District Attorneys Association and Clerk of Court Association
Case Number: 3:2023cv00560
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Wesley Ricks (NLT)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wesley Ricks (NLT)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clerk of Court Association, Department of Justice, Louisiana State Bar Association, filed by Wesley Ricks.(NLT)
August 15, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Expedite. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite by Wesley Ricks (NLT)
July 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clerk of Court Association, Department of Justice, District Attorneys Association, Louisiana State Bar Association, filed by Wesley Ricks.(NLT)
July 18, 2023 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorneys Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of Court Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?