Ricks v. State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Defendant: State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners, West Feliciana Parish and Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 3:2023cv00651
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE for the Clerk of Court and Trial Judge by Wesley Ricks (NLT)
September 12, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Wesley Ricks (NLT)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wesley Ricks (NLT)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Louisiana State Penitentiary, State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, West Feliciana Parish, filed by Wesley Ricks.(NLT)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners, Louisiana State Penitentiary, State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, West Feliciana Parish, filed by Wesley Ricks.(NLT)
August 4, 2023 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Feliciana Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?