Wascom v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gabriel J. Wascom
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01344
Filed: September 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2023 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/5/2023. (BLR)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allied Trust Insurance Company.(Matthias, Kyle) Modified on 9/27/2023 to edit docket text. (JEG).
September 21, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Allied Trust Insurance Company, Affiliate/Interested Person The Monson Law Firm, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Godbey Giardina Law Group, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Gabriel J. Wascom, Affiliate/Interested Person Flagstar Bank for Allied Trust Insurance Company.. (Matthias, Kyle)
September 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement #1 Notice of Removal, by Allied Trust Insurance Company (Matthias, Kyle)
September 21, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC for Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Matthias, Kyle)
September 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of List of All Parties and Pleadings by Allied Trust Insurance Company to #1 Notice of Removal. (Matthias, Kyle) Modified on 9/22/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
September 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC, Ascension Parish, Case Number 137,953 Div E. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2640296), filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Ex. A - State Court Record, #3 Attachment Exhibit B - LDI - Allied Trust, #4 Attachment Verification)(Matthias, Kyle) Modified on 9/22/2023 to edit State Court information. (JEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wascom v. Allied Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel J. Wascom
Represented By: Devlan Melancon, Sr.
Represented By: Aaron Godbey
Represented By: Dante Cortello
Represented By: Michael S Giardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Matthias
Represented By: Rowan W. Stoehr
Represented By: Matthew D. Monson
Represented By: Austin Tyler Welch
Represented By: Erin W. Berggren
Represented By: John Covington Henry
Represented By: John Dante Mineo, IV
Represented By: Lauren A. Lam
Represented By: Nathan Ryne Hand
Represented By: Rachel L. Flarity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?