Carter v. Dillard's Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Venessa Carter
Defendant: Dillard's Inc. and Higbee Louisiana, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00510
Filed: June 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dillard's Inc., Higbee Louisiana, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Venessa Carter, Affiliate/Interested Person Alex washington, Affiliate/Interested Person Daryl Washington, Affiliate/Interested Person Michael B Victorian, Affiliate/Interested Person Zachary A Lester, Affiliate/Interested Person Gregory Stevens for Dillard's Inc., Higbee Louisiana, LLC.. (Lester, Zachary)
August 13, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (EDC)
August 13, 2024 *** Add Interested Person by Dillard's Inc., Higbee Louisiana, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Higbee Louisiana, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Dillard Texas Central, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Dillard Texas East, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Dillard Texas Four-Point, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Dillard Texas, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person DSS Uniter, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Dillard Store Services, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Dillard International, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Construction Developers, LLC for Dillard's Inc., Higbee Louisiana, LLC. (Lester, Zachary)
August 12, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stevens, Gregory)
July 27, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Venessa Carter. Dillard's Inc. served on 7/10/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (Washington, Alex)
July 11, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Venessa Carter. Higbee Louisiana, LLC served on 7/8/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. (Washington, Alex)
July 1, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Higbee Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (CIS)
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Dillard's Inc. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (CIS)
June 29, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Submitted as to (Washington, Alex)
June 29, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Submitted as to Dillard's Inc (Washington, Alex)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2024 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 8/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/26/2024. (KAH)
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Registered Agent Solutions, Inc. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (JEG)
June 22, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Venessa Carter identifying Corporate Parent Dillard's Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Higbee Louisiana, LLC for Venessa Carter.. (Washington, Alex)
June 22, 2024 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dillard's Inc., filed by Venessa Carter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment summons, #2 Attachment civil cover sheet)(Washington, Alex) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/24/2024 to flatten document) (JEG).
June 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BLAMDC-2767477.), filed by Venessa Carter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment civil cover sheet, #2 Attachment summons)(Washington, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Dillard's Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Lester
Represented By: Michael B. Victorian
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Lester
Represented By: Michael B. Victorian
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venessa Carter
Represented By: Alex James Washington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?