Kimball v. Tiser et al

Plaintiff: Henry Kimball
Defendant: Tiser, Duplechain, Germillion, Hope and T. Milligan
Case Number: 1:2010cv00688
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 1 Complaint, as 12 , 17 , 19 Amended. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/03/14. (crt,Burge, J)
January 12, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 57 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 54 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Tiser, Germillion, T. Milligan, Blaine Villamerette, Blaine Lachney, Hope, Benson, Duplechain,. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/12/12. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 12, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 49 Report and Recommendations in re: 47 Motion for TRO filed by Henry Kimball. ORDERED the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 10/12/2011. (crt,Leleux, M)
February 8, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 30 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge. ORDERED plaintiff's claim is DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and failing to state a claim for which relief can be granted as to James LeBlanc, Warden Lynn Cooper and James Dupas.. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 02/07/2011. (crt,Leleux, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimball v. Tiser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duplechain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Germillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?