Case name not on file

Plaintiff: Cynthia Ayers, et al
Case Number: 1:2010cv00925
Filed: June 11, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: La Salle
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 213 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Remaining Claims Asserted by All Remaining Plaintiffs filed by A N R Pipeline Co, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C, 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims Asserted by Plaintiffs, Linda Parker, Darwin Thacker, Evelyn Thacker, Hilliard Thacker, Tyler Thacker James Thacker, Michael Price, Roxann Price, Travis Poe, Angela Johnson, James V Hayes, Ricky Shi filed by A N R Pipeline Co, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 7/21/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 29, 2015 181 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A N R Pipeline Co, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 01/29/2015. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 3, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 104 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiff, Donald Cooper filed by A N R Pipeline Co, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C, 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Discovery Plaintiffs' Claims filed by A N R Pipeline Co, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 12/02/13. (crt,Burge, J)
March 7, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 68 MOTION for Settlement Motion to Enforce Settlement filed by A N R Pipeline Co, TransCanada U S A Pipeline Services L L C. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/7/12. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ayers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?