Hymes v. Natchitoches et al

Plaintiff: Henry Hymes
Defendant: City of Natchitoches, Wayne McCullen, Edd Lee and Brian Wimberly
Case Number: 1:2010cv01167
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM RULING re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edd Lee, Brian Wimberly, City of Natchitoches, Wayne McCullen. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/10/12. (crt,Kennedy, T)
July 30, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edd Lee, Brian Wimberly, City of Natchitoches, Wayne McCullen. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 07/30/12. (crt,Guillot, M)
January 14, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Edd Lee, Brian Wimberly, City of Natchitoches, Wayne McCullen, 30 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/14/11. (crt,Roaix, G)
December 20, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION to Dismiss RECOMMENDING that the motion be GRANTED and that the claims against defendants under LSA-R.S. 42:1169 and against the Mayor pursuant to 42 USA Section 1981 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. A party may respond to another party's objections within 14 days after being served with a copy thereof. Objections to R&R due by 1/6/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 12/17/10. (crt,Burge, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hymes v. Natchitoches et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Natchitoches
Represented By: Steven M Oxenhandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne McCullen
Represented By: Steven M Oxenhandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edd Lee
Represented By: Steven M Oxenhandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wimberly
Represented By: Steven M Oxenhandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Hymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?