Mitchell v Weyerhaeuser Co

Plaintiff: Donald Mitchell
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Co
Case Number: 1:2010cv01240
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Natchitoches
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 129 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting 131 Motion for Bill of Costs styled as "Objection to Clerk's Taxation of Costs". The plaintiff's challenge to the court's taxation of costs is DENIED. Th e defendant's objection to the Clerk's taxation is GRANTED and the Clerk's Taxation of Costs, Doc No 128 , is amended to add Weyerhaeuser's copy costs in the amount of $1,141.76 as a recoverable item of costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 02/06/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)
March 17, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 89 MOTION to Strike 79 Amended Document, filed by Weyerhaeuser N R Co, 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Weyerhaeuser N R Co. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/15/14. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 25, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Weyerhaeuser N R Co, 36 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Billy Benefield Jr attached to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Donald Mitchell, 55 MOTION to Strike [4 8] Exhibit Declaration of Peter John Corak and Reply Memorandum to Weyerhaeuser's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Declaration of Billy Benefield, Jr. filed by Donald Mitchell. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 9/25/12. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v Weyerhaeuser Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mitchell
Represented By: Vicki C Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Co
Represented By: Catherine Louise Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?