James v. Mason

Plaintiff: Calvin James
Defendant: Curtis Mason
Case Number: 1:2010cv01706
Filed: November 2, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting Report and Recommendations re 74 Report and Recommendations, granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/9/13. (crt,Roaix, G)
March 7, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 48 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss 41 is GRANTED and James' action against the United States is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for lack of matter jurisdiction. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment 41 is GRANTED and James' action against Mason is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, TI IS ORDERED that James' action against all remaining defendants is DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/7/12. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 19, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 7 Report and Recommendations; plaintiffs claims against the Bureau of Prisons and against Curtis Mason in his official capacity are Denied and Dismissed with prejudice for failing to state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 4/19/11. (crt,McDaniel, C)
February 23, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 7 Report and Recommendations; Claims against the Bureau of Prisons and against Curtis Mason in his OFFICIAL capacity are Denied and Dismissed with prejudice for failing to state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 2/22/11. (crt,McDaniel, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?