Griffin v. Avoyelles Correctional Center

Plaintiff: Graylyn Griffin
Defendant: Warden Avoyelles Correctional Center
Case Number: 1:2010cv01892
Filed: December 13, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Avoyelles
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 29 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/06/12. (crt,Lundy, N)
February 16, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 25 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Griffin's Section 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 2/16/12. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 24, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DOCUMENTS: Clerk directed to mail this order to DA, 12th Judicial District Court. District Attorney is requested to provide specified documents within 60 days of this date; set Pro Se Response (response by DA) due by 7/25/2011. Failure to comply will result in formal response ordered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on May 24, 2011. (crt,Dunford, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Avoyelles Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graylyn Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Avoyelles Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?