Davis v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Rayfield Davis
Defendant: Ducote, Robert Ewing, John Doe, Ronnie Howard, James Cooper, James LeBlanc, Lynn Cooper, Clyde Benson and Paul Gaspard
Case Number: 1:2010cv01920
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Avoyelles
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendations re 41 Report and Recommendations ; granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/7/13. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 21, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 33 Report and Recommendations ; denying 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/21/12. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 9, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 23 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge in re: 16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lynn Cooper. The Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 01/06/2012. (crt,Leleux, M)
June 20, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against James LeBlanc, Clyde Benson, Paul Gaspard, James Cooper, Robert Ewing, John Doe and Ronnie Howard are DISMISSED for failing to state a claim for which relief can be granted. Service of process has been ordered on Warden Cooper and Sgt. Ducote. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 6/20/11. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gaspard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayfield Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?