Bruce v. Little et al

Plaintiff: Robert Bruce
Defendant: Bodie Little, Daniel Alsup, Sheriffs Office of Winn Parish, Tommy Foster, Walter Hampton and Phillip Vines
Case Number: 1:2011cv01541
Filed: August 23, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING ; 96 Report and Recommendations and granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Bruce's action is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 08/29/16. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 28, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ; adopting re 89 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Walter Hampton be DENIED AND DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(b) and 1915A. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/28/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 2, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 55 Report and Recommendations, ; granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 42 is GRANTED and Bruce's action against the "Winn Parish Sheriff's Office" is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 01/02/2015. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 16, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 12 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims be and are hereby DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/16/12. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Little et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodie Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Alsup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Winn Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Vines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?