Veal v. Kuplesky et al

Plaintiff: James Veal
Defendant: Stephen Kuplesky, Timothy Keith, Mark Daniel and Correction Corp of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv00566
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2017 119 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 116 Report and Recommendations; granting 110 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing Veal's action against Dr. Singleton. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/7/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
March 23, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING ;re 87 Report and Recommendations. granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Veal's complaint against Nurse Gaskill, Nurse Mary, and Nurse Warren is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 4(m). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [doc 75] is GRANTED and Veal's action against Amy Brunson, Daniel Marr, Stephen Kuplesky, Nicole Walker, Barbara Spence, and Corrections Corporation of America is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/22/16. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 25, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 40 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, denying 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 8/25/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 9, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 12 , denying 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/9/13. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veal v. Kuplesky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Veal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Kuplesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?