Gaines v. Techline Inc

Plaintiff: Kenneth B Gaines
Defendant: Techline Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv00576
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 131 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/16/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 29, 2017 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Techline Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/29/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 11, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Request for Sanctions. It is further ORDERED that all portions of the Subpoena (Doc. 73-2) except the portion requesting production of J W McKee' ;s driver logs and manifests. It is further ORDERED that Techline Inc shall produce J W McKee's driver logs and manifests to counsel for Plaintiff within 14 days of the date of this order. It is further ORDERED that the request for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/11/2016. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Techline Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth B Gaines
Represented By: Pamela R Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techline Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?