Kansas City Southern Railway Co v. Precision Land Leveling L L C et al

Plaintiff: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Defendant: Precision Land Leveling L L C, Q B E Insurance Corp, D S K Ltd, Dewey S Kendrick, III and A B C Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2013cv02157
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2016 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 266 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) dismissing all of Kansas City Southern Railway Company's claims against American Reliable, Praetorian, 3-V Partnership, Steven D Vinson, Donna S Vinson, Steven D Vinson, DSK, Ltd and Dewey S Kendrick III. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 11/7/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 17, 2016 246 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 201 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by 3 V Partnership, American Reliable Insurance Co, Donna Smith Vinson, Steven D Vinson, Dewey S Kendrick, III, Praetorian Insurance Co, Steven Blake Vinson, D S K Ltd, 203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on KCS' Loss of Profit Claims filed by American Reliable Insurance Co, 194 MOTION to Strike 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Independent Contractor Status and No Le gal Duty Owed by Landowners, 189 Reply to Response to Motion,, 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Causation filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Independent Contractor Status and No Legal Duty Owed by Landowners filed by 3 V Partnership, Steven B Vinson, Donna Smith Vinson, Steven D Vinson, Steven Blake Vinson. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 2/17/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 17, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 66 Report and Recommendations; denying 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 6/16/14. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kansas City Southern Railway Co v. Precision Land Leveling L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Represented By: David Lee Bruce
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Land Leveling L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q B E Insurance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D S K Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey S Kendrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?