Matthews v. Alexandria

Plaintiff: Terri L Matthews
Defendant: City of Alexandria
Case Number: 1:2013cv02303
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Natchitoches
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER; granting 66 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 68 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 77 Report and Recommendations.; terminating 79 Report and Recommendations.; adopting Report and Recommendations re 80 Report and Recommendations. This suit is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 06/15/2015. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 9, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: 54 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that City of Alexandria's motion to dismiss 50 is GRANTED IN PART and Matthews' Section 1983 claims against the City of Alexandria are DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the City of Alexandria's motion to dismiss 50 is DENIED as to Matthews' state law claims. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 12/08/14. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 11, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 36 Report and Recommendations; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 8/11/14. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Alexandria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alexandria
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?