Hanks v. Kieth et al

Plaintiff: Davin Hanks
Defendant: Tim Kieth and Pamela Horne
Case Number: 1:2013cv02999
Filed: November 5, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 86 Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 11/28/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 30, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING the Report and Recommendations re 66 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that LeBlanc's motion to dismiss 57 is GRANTED IN PART as to Hanks' claims against LeBlanc in his official capacity, GRANTED IN PART as to Hanks' claims against LeBlanc in his individual capacity for compensatory damages, and DENIED IN PART as to Hanks' claims against LeBlanc in his individual capacity for punitive or nominal damages. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/30/2015. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 21, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING ; re 48 Report and Recommendations, denying 41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 41 Motion for TRO; adopting. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/21/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 13, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment including their "motion to dismiss Hanks' IFP status" 24 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 11/12/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
December 10, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendations GRANTING 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants are ORDERED to place Hanks in a true protective custody which does not allow the inmates from whom he is to be protected, or their associates, access to him at any time.. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 12/10/13. (crt,Burge, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanks v. Kieth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davin Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Kieth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?