Frazier v. Keith et al
Plaintiff: Claude R Frazier
Defendant: Timothy Keith, Singleton, Daniel Mars, Corrections Corp of America, James LeBlanc, Kuplesky and Brunson
Case Number: 1:2013cv03110
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 111 Report and Recommendations; denying 102 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 104 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's remaining claims against Defendants are dismissed. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 1/17/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 99 Report and Recommendations; granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants' under 42 U.S.C. 1983 for alleged violations of the Eighth Amendment be DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 11/30/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JUDGMENT adopting 91 Report and Recommendations, denying 90 Motion for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/3/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion and Order for Physical Examination. IT IS ORDERED that defendants, on or before February 8, 2016 comply with the requirements of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/20/2016. (crt,Haik, K)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT ADOPTING denying 9 Motion for TRO; adopting Report and Recommendations re 14 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 4/8/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Keith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude R Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuplesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?