Tilmon v. Keith et al
Plaintiff: Terry D Tilmon
Defendant: Timothy Keith, Corrections Corp of America, Kevin Jordan, Cotton and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 1:2013cv03127
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 85 Motion in Limine; vacating 94 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/5/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 **VACATED***REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 85 MOTION in Limine filed by Kevin Jordan, Timothy Keith, Corrections Corp of America, Richard Cotton. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendants' MIL 85 be DENIED as premature. Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/4/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)(b) Modified on 12/5/2017 (Tice, Y)to reflect this is vacated per Memorandum Order 95 .
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 69 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; Ordered that Tilmon's complaint against the State of Louisiana is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 11/10/16. (crt,Tice, Y)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilmon v. Keith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry D Tilmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?