Hauenstein v. Rapides Parish et al

Plaintiff: Kyle Smith Hauenstein
Defendant: Sheriffs Dept Rapides Parish, Rapides Parish Detention Center I, William Hilton and Pat Ashtley
Case Number: 1:2014cv03188
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 92 Report and Recommendations; denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED that Defendants' second motion for summary judgment 74 is DENIED as to Sheriff Hilton on both his individual and official capacity claims and as to both the federal and state law claims. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 2/7/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 30, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 92 Report and Recommendations; denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 1/30/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 19, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ; declining to adopt 73 Report and Recommendations, denying as moot 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 9/16/16. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauenstein v. Rapides Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Smith Hauenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Dept Rapides Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapides Parish Detention Center I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Ashtley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?