DeRamus et al v. Alexandria et al

Plaintiff: Jimmie DeRamus, Tammie DeRamus-Credeur, Johnnie DeRamus and Peggy DeRamus
Defendant: City of Alexandria, Police Dept of Alexandria, Chris Besson, Ricky Vercher, Patrick Harrison, Shannon Blackwood, Lynn Hall, W Neal Bates, K Johnson, Chris Ryder, Doug Alfred, Loren Lampert, Jimmy Hay, Lee Leach, Andy Van Dyke, James C Downs and Unknown Officers
Case Number: 1:2014cv03222
Filed: November 10, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING Setting forth reasons for granting 94 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by James C Downs, Andy Van Dyke, 92 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Shannon Blackwood, 85 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs< /i> filed by Doug Alfred, Lee Leach, Chris Besson, Patrick Harrison, K Johnson, Chris Ryder, City of Alexandria, Lynn Hall, Ricky Vercher, W Neal Bates, Jimmy Hay, Loren Lampert. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 05/23/2016. (crt,Crick, S)
February 2, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shannon Blackwood. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 2/2/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 29, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Claims of Jimmie DeRamus and Peggy DeRamus filed by Chris Besson. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/29/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 27, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Claims of Jimmie DeRamus and Peggy DeRamus filed by Doug Alfred, W Neal Bates, Patrick Harrison, K Johnson, Chris Ryder, Lynn Hall, Ricky Vercher. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/27/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 25, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James C Downs, Andy Van Dyke. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/25/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 21, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Claims of Johnnie DeRamus filed by Doug Alfred, Lee Leach, Chris Besson, Patrick Harrison, K Johnson, Chris Ryder, City of Alexandria, Lynn Hall, Shannon Blackwood, Ricky Vercher, W Neal Bates, Jimmy Hay, Loren Lampert. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 01/21/16. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 20, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Tammie DeRamus-Credeur filed by Doug Alfred, Lee Leach, Chris Besson, Patrick Harrison, K Johnson, Chris Ryder, City of Alexandria, Lynn Hall, Shannon Blackwood, Ricky Vercher, W Neal Bates, Jimmy Hay, Loren Lampert. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/20/16. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeRamus et al v. Alexandria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie DeRamus
Represented By: Charles A Schutte, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie DeRamus-Credeur
Represented By: Charles A Schutte, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie DeRamus
Represented By: Charles A Schutte, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy DeRamus
Represented By: Charles A Schutte, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alexandria
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept of Alexandria
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Besson
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Vercher
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Harrison
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Blackwood
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Hall
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Neal Bates
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Johnson
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ryder
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Alfred
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Lampert
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Hay
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Leach
Represented By: H Bradford Calvit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Van Dyke
Represented By: Daniel E Broussard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Downs
Represented By: Daniel E Broussard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?