Omran v. Roy et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Ahmed Hassan Abdallah Omran
Defendant: Nicole Roy, Unknown Defendant and USA
Case Number: 1:2016cv00042
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 129 Report and Recommendation, denying 118 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 12/7/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 125 Report and Recommendations, denying 114 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 10/19/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM RULING re 107 SECOND MOTION for Reconsideration re 84 JUDGMENT granting Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mohammed Ahmed Hassan Abdallah Omran. The court will issue an amended judgment in conformity with these findings. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 6/26/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM RULING re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by USA. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/20/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendations re 36 Report and Recommendations, denying 29 Motion for TRO; denying 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 6/20/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omran v. Roy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Ahmed Hassan Abdallah Omran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Roy
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?