Authement Jr v. Hernandez et al

Defendant: Meagan Hernandez, Malcolm Smalls and Unknown Lt
Petitioner: Brian Authement, Jr
Case Number: 1:2016cv00151
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: East Feliciana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 105 Report and Recommendations, ; denying 70 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 8/14/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
July 11, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration re 93 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/11/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
January 27, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 55 Report and Recommendations, denying 44 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 1/26/17. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Authement Jr v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meagan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Smalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Authement, Jr
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?