Ford v. Richwood Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Roman Ford
Defendant: Warden Richwood Correctional Center, Coleman and Tubbs
Case Number: 1:2017cv00194
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: La Salle
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 28 Report and Recommendations denying and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(2)(B) and 1915A. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/10/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 10/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/25/2017. (crt,Williams, L)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint. Pro Se Response due by 7/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/14/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Richwood Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Richwood Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?