Manning v. Circle K Stores Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tarretta Manning
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc and Travelers Constitution State Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2017cv00498
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW ORDER - Defendants ORDERED to supplement their response by June 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/26/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 22, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW ORDER - Second Compliance Deadline set for 5/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/22/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 13, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order upon any and all Defendants IMMEDIATELY upon receipt of proof of service or an appearance. IT IS ORDERED not later than 21 days from service of this Order on Defendants Circle K Stores Inc and Travelers Constitution State Insurance Co SHALL FILE: (1) a Jurisdictional Memorandum setting forth the citizenship of all parties to this lawsuit, specifically including the nature and citizenship of identity of Travelers Constitution State Insurance Co; and (2) a motion for leave to amend the jurisdictional allegations of the Notice of Removal to adequately allege diversity jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff will be allowed 7 days from receipt of Defendants' memoranda to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/13/2017. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Circle K Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarretta Manning
Represented By: Constance Annette Colley
Represented By: Matthew Donald Hemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc
Represented By: Kelly McCall Brian
Represented By: Ryan Jared Roemershauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Constitution State Insurance Co
Represented By: Kelly McCall Brian
Represented By: Ryan Jared Roemershauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?