State Of Louisiana et al v. B E P C O L P et al
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Defendant: Hess Corp, B E P C O L P, B O P C O L P, Chisolm Trail Ventures L P and Chevron U S A Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00973
Filed: July 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 25, 2018 Filing 48 RULING Adopting the #45 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The #13 Motion to Transfer Case Case is GRANTED and this matter including the #15 Motion to Remand, is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Louisiana - Alexandria Division. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/25/2018. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 47 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Order)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/18/2018 to edit text (LLH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 46 OBJECTION to #45 Report and Recommendations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Map and Soil Data Tables, #2 Exhibit B - Title and Appearance Pages of Hess Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Title and Appearance Pages of Tureau Deposition)(Owen, Diane) Modified on 7/17/2018 to rotate and replace exhibit 1 (LLH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #13 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Hess Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., #15 MOTION to Remand filed by the State of Louisiana. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that the #13 Motion to Transfer Venue be GRANTED and that this matter, including the #15 Motion to Remand, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Alexandria Division. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/2/2018. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Substitute Lead Attorney Designation on behalf of Hess Corporation. Jonathan A. Hunter be and is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Hess Corporation in this case. Hess Corporation's designation of lead attorney under Local Rule 11(b) be changed from Jonathan A. Hunter to Elizabeth S. Wheeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/21/2018. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 MOTION to Substitute Corrected Pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/21/2018. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
May 15, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #42 MOTION to Substitute Corrected pleading . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Substitute Corrected pleading by Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment)(Wheeler, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
May 14, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #41 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Substitute Lead Attorney Designation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Substitute Lead Attorney Designation by Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wheeler, Elizabeth) Modified to edit text on 5/14/2018 (SGO). Modified on 5/22/2018 to replace main document as per rec doc 43 (KAH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 40 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Remand (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau) filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s #38 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum is hereby GRANTED. The clerk's office is instructed to file the Second Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Remand [R. Doc. 38-1] into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/22/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
March 21, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Remand by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Order)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Remand (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau) filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. The clerk's office is directed to file R. Docs. 35-1 and 35-2 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/12/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) Modified to edit text on 2/15/2018 (BLR). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
February 12, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #35 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Remand by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Pleading)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
February 8, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Districrt Court for the Western District of Louisiana Alexandria Division . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2017-11, this case is reassigned from Judge James J. Brady to Judge Shelly D. Dick. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/21/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 14, 2017 Filing 33 Reply Memorandum in Support of #15 MOTION to Remand (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau) filed by State of Louisiana. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Plaintiff in Support of Motion for Remand. The clerk's office is directed to file R. Doc. 29-1 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/13/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 31 REPLY to #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Districrt Court for the Western District of Louisiana Alexandria Division , #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Hess Corporation. (Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 13, 2017 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #29 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Plaintiff in Support of Motion for Remand (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion to to Suspend BRIEFING DEADLINES PENDING MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/12/2017. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Plaintiff in Support of Motion for Remand (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau) by State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum of Plaintiff in Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Certificate of No Opposition, #3 Proposed Order)(Marcello, Victor) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Motions No Longer Referred: #28 Consent MOTION to Stay BRIEFING DEADLINES PENDING MOTION TO REMAND. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 7, 2017 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #28 Consent MOTION to Stay BRIEFING DEADLINES PENDING MOTION TO REMAND. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 28 Consent MOTION to Suspend BRIEFING DEADLINES PENDING MOTION TO REMAND by All Plaintiffs. (Owen, Diane) Modified on 12/7/2017 to edit text (ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Remand (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau) filed by BEPCO, L.P., BOPCO L.P., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chisolm Trail Ventures, L.P., Hess Corporation. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk's office is directed to file R. Doc. 25-1 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/05/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
December 1, 2017 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #25 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Districrt Court for the Western District of Louisiana Alexandria Division (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau) filed by State of Louisiana. (Marcello, Victor) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Conventional Exhibit Filed as per #22 Order by BEPCO, L.P., BOPCO L.P., Chisolm Trail Ventures, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Conventionally File Exhibit 1 to 18 Motion to Dismiss by BEPCO, L.P., BOPCO L.P., Chisolm Trail Ventures, L.P. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/17/2017. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE on #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim :. Opposition, limited to 10 pages, to the motion shall be filed on or before 12/8/2017. The mover may file a reply brief, limited to 5 pages, within 14 days of the filing of the opposition.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOPCO L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corporation, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Exploration and Production South Inc, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil South Holdings, Inc. for BOPCO L.P... (Chauvin, Hunter) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION Leave to Conventionally File Exhibit 1 to #18 Motion to Dismiss by BEPCO, L.P., BOPCO L.P., Chisolm Trail Ventures, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jane) Modified to edit the text on 11/17/2017 (KAH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BEPCO, L.P., BOPCO L.P., Chisolm Trail Ventures, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certified copy of Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Operator History from Notice)(Jackson, Jane) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhbiti A)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 16 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #13 Motion to Transfer Case and #15 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to CANCEL the Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2017 at this time. No status report is due. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 13, 2017 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Remand (ex rel. Justin Dale Tureau). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 10, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Marcello, Victor) Modified to edit text on 11/13/2017 (SGO). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE on #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Districrt Court for the Western District of Louisiana Alexandria Division :. Opposition, limited to 10 pages, to the motion shall be filed on or before 11/29/2017. The mover may file a reply brief, limited to 5 pages, within 14 days of the filing of the opposition.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Districrt Court for the Western District of Louisiana Alexandria Division by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2017 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/14/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/26/2017. (BLR) Main Document 12 replaced on 10/27/2017 to correct dates in order (BLR). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendants shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days, through November 16, 2017, within which to answer or present other defenses or objections to Plaintiff's initial pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/26/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Initial Petition by All Defendants. (Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chisolm Trail Ventures, L.P.. (Jackson, Jane) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEPCO, L.P.. (Jackson, Jane) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 7 Consent to Removal by Chisolm Trail Ventures, L.P. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 6 Consent to Removal by BOPCO L.P. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 5 Consent to Removal by BEPCO, L.P. (EDC) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/20/2017) (EDC). Modified on 10/20/2017 to flatten document.(EDC). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation. (Bambrick, Erin) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of List of Collateral Proceedings And/or Refiled Cases Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3(A) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Hess Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron U.S.A. Inc... (Gelpi, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C661482. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1657322), filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Gelpi, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/20/2017) (EDC). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/20/2017) (EDC). Modified on 10/20/2017 to rotate pages.(EDC). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/20/2017) (EDC). Modified on 10/20/2017 to replace correct exhibit. (EDC). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Of Louisiana et al v. B E P C O L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corp
Represented By: Robert B McNeal
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Bambrick
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Jonathan A Hunter
Represented By: Elizabeth S Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B E P C O L P
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr
Represented By: Jane Allison Jackson
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B O P C O L P
Represented By: Michael P Cash
Represented By: Hunter A Chauvin
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisolm Trail Ventures L P
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr
Represented By: Jane Allison Jackson
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc
Represented By: John C Funderburk
Represented By: Richard Dean McConnell, Jr
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Juneau
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Gelpi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?