Escobar v. Sessions
Plaintiff: Joshua Escobar
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv01094
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Joshua Escobar, LaSalle Detention Facility 830 Pine Hill Rd Jena, LA 71342, re: #8 Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely, #7 Mail Returned, #6 Mail Returned returned marked: RTS: No longer here. (crt,Haik, K)
September 18, 2018 REMARK: Documents 6-8 resent to plaintiff at LaSalle Detention Facility, 830 Pine Hill Rd, Jena, LA 71342 per phone call request on 9/18/18. (crt,Haik, K)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Joshua Escobar, LaSalle Detention Facility, re: #8 Memorandum Order, returned marked: Return to Sender; No Longer Here. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend petition. Pro Se Response due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Joshua Escobar, LaSalle Detention Facility, re: #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis returned marked: Return to Sender: No Longer Here. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Joshua Escobar, LaSalle Detention Facility, re: 4 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: Return to Sender: No Longer Here. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/24/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/24/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes., CASE REFERRED to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 64635007292, filing fee $5) filed by Joshua Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?