Parker v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: Gabrielle M Parker
Defendant: David C Cole, David Rivera, Jefferson B Sessions, III and John F Kelly
Case Number: 1:2018cv01107
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U S Attorney General. Served on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018.(crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to District Director ICE. Served on 10/3/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney, Warden LaSalle Detention Facility. Served on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden LaSalle Detention Facility, District Director BICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/24/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/30/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 27, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 5:18-cv-1107 from Shreveport Division to Alexandria Division. New Case Number 1:18-cv-1107. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0536-3737995) filed by Gabrielle M Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marriage License, #2 Exhibit Petitioner's Declaration, #3 Exhibit Husband's Declaration, #4 Exhibit Regional Medical Center, #5 Exhibit Decision to Continue Detention, #6 Exhibit Photo, #7 Exhibit Medical History 1, #8 Exhibit Medical History 2, #9 Exhibit Punishment Before Justice Article, #10 Exhibit Order of Supervision)(Attorney Kathryn Jakuback Burke added to party Gabrielle M Parker(pty:pet))(aty,Burke, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle M Parker
Represented By: Kathryn Jakuback Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?