Julian v. Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Edgar Tibakweitira Julian
Defendant: Bureau of Immigration & Customs Enforcement and U S Dept of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01108
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/2/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Chicola, C)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IT IS RECOMMENDED that re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian be DISMISSED without prejudice as premature. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/24/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (crt,HaikSld, K)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (crt,HaikSld, K)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #4 Letter) (Devillier, W).
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 64635007298, filing fee $5) filed by Edgar Tibakweitira Julian. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibits, #4 Letter, #5 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julian v. Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Tibakweitira Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?