Jobe v. Sessions

Plaintiff: Mamadou Jobe
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv01248
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to District Director ICE. Served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General. Served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden LaSalle Detention Facility, US Attorney. Served on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED by certified mail as to Jefferson B Sessions, III, District Director- ICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts)(crt,Chicola, C)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/5/2018. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/26/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
September 21, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 54635059951, filing fee $5) filed by Mamadou Jobe. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibit, #4 Notice of Refiling, #5 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jobe v. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamadou Jobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?