James et al v. American Honda Motor Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cearey James, Brett T. Lasyone and Brett T Lasyone
Defendant: Estate of Emily Dauzart, Honda R&D Co., LTD, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., American Honda Motor Co Inc, Emily Dauzart Estate and Honda R & D Co Ltd
Intervenor Plaintiff: Carter Dauzart, Natalie Dauzart and Donna Kay Robinson
Case Number: 1:2018cv01316
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #11 MOTION to Appoint Custodian /Legal Representative for Emily Dauzart filed by Brett T Lasyone, Cearey James, #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Brett T Lasyone, Cearey James Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 11/30/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Appoint Custodian /Legal Representative for Emily Dauzart filed by American Honda Motor Co Inc. (aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #11 MOTION to Appoint Custodian /Legal Representative for Emily Dauzart. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. Motion day set for 12/14/2018 before Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. Motion day set for 12/14/2018 before Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Custodian /Legal Representative for Emily Dauzart by Cearey James, Brett T Lasyone. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Donna Kay Robinson, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Ritch, Joseph) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION Amend Complaint with opposition by Cearey James, Brett T Lasyone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading)(aty,Ritch, Joseph) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit text and capture more accurate event (FinnSld, P).
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Cearey James, Brett T Lasyone. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Donna Kay Robinson, #3 Exhibit B- Crash Report)(aty,Ritch, Joseph) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by American Honda Motor Co Inc . (Attachments: #1 State court notice of filing)(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 12/8/2018.)(crt,Roaix, G)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Honda Motor Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Co Inc. (aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal,, sent to Francis H Brown, III, Colvin G Norwood, Jr, Deirdre C McGlinchey on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/23/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 262,339 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3774454) filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A.1-86)(Attorney Francis H Brown, III added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Brown, Francis)
October 9, 2018 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Carter Dauzart, Donna Kay Robinson, Natalie Dauzart.(Attorney Jared Ryan Dunahoe added to party Carter Dauzart(pty:intvp), Attorney Jared Ryan Dunahoe added to party Natalie Dauzart(pty:intvp), Attorney Jared Ryan Dunahoe added to party Donna Kay Robinson(pty:intvp))(crt,Thigpen, M) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
October 9, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 9, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint, Intervenor Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. American Honda Motor Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carter Dauzart
Represented By: Jared Ryan Dunahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Natalie Dauzart
Represented By: Jared Ryan Dunahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Donna Kay Robinson
Represented By: Jared Ryan Dunahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Emily Dauzart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R&D Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre C McGlinchey
Represented By: Francis H Brown, III
Represented By: Colvin G Norwood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: Deirdre C McGlinchey
Represented By: Francis H Brown, III
Represented By: Colvin G Norwood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Dauzart Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R & D Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cearey James
Represented By: Samuel Charles Ward
Represented By: Shawn Michael Bordelon
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett T. Lasyone
Represented By: Samuel Charles Ward
Represented By: Shawn Michael Bordelon
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett T Lasyone
Represented By: Samuel Charles Ward
Represented By: Shawn Michael Bordelon
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?