E B C I Inc. v. Green Solar Louisiana L L C et al
Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of EBCI, Inc. and E B C I Inc
Defendant: Green Solar Louisiana, LLC, Aegis Security Insurance Co and Green Solar Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 1:2018cv01437
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 1/23/2019 at 11:15 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor Courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Counsel shall arrive ten minutes before the status conference to meet with the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/20/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED Plan of Work by E B C I Inc and Aegis Security Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Forester, Jonathan) Modified filers on 12/19/2018 (Bunting, M).
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aegis Security Insurance Co.(aty,Fiore, Jennifer)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E B C I Inc. (aty,Forester, Jonathan)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Aegis Security Insurance Co answer due 12/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/4/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aegis Security Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent K2 Insurance Services LLC, Other Affiliate Aegis Security Inc for Aegis Security Insurance Co. (aty,Fiore, Jennifer)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with opposition by Aegis Security Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Jennifer Ann Fiore added to party Aegis Security Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Fiore, Jennifer)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 1/1/2019.) Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 11/15/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E B C I Inc. Aegis Security Insurance Co served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (aty,Forester, Jonathan)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/6/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aegis Security Insurance Co, Green Solar Louisiana L L C (crt,Bunting, M)
November 2, 2018 Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes added. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aegis Security Insurance Co, Green Solar Louisiana L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3797164) filed by E B C I Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Attorney Jonathan S Forester added to party E B C I Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Forester, Jonathan) Modified docket text on 11/5/2018 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E B C I Inc. v. Green Solar Louisiana L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of EBCI, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan S Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E B C I Inc
Represented By: Jonathan S Forester
Represented By: Michael Robert Carson Riess, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Solar Louisiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Susan Nathalie Eccles
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Solar Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?