Edmond et al v. Bundy et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Edmond and Bridget Edmond
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Insurance Company, Mineral Mountain Trucking, Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Kelton Hughes, Mark Bundy Trucking, Scottsdale Indemnity Co, Eugene English, Pico Incorporated, Preston Eubanks, Mark Bundy, Progressive Insurance Co, Mountain Laurel Insurance Co, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Mountain Laurel Assurance Co, Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Co, Great West Casualty Insurance Co, Scottsdale Insurance Co and Pico Inc
Undetermined: Great West Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01563
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 3/7/2019 at 11:15 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Counsel shall arrive ten minutes before the status conference to meet with the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/18/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Preston Eubanks.(Attorney Michael P Corry added to party Preston Eubanks(pty:dft))(aty,Corry, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kelton Hughes (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 14, 2019 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kelton Hughes, requested by Daniel Edmond, Bridget Edmond. (aty,Knoll, Laura)
January 14, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Bridget Edmond, Daniel Edmond. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Knoll, Laura)
January 11, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Edmond, Bridget Edmond. Preston Eubanks served, via Long Arm Statute, on 11/7/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event which calculates appropriate answer due date. See pdf document filed as #21 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kimberly G. Anderson in place of Tasha W. Hebert with consent sought but not yet obtained by Eugene English, Pico Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hebert, Tasha) Modified on 1/14/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Damages served on Preston Eubanks on November 7, 2018, filed by Bridget Edmond, Daniel Edmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Long-Arm Service letter, #2 Exhibit USPS tracking)(aty,Knoll, Laura)
January 11, 2019 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kelton Hughes, requested by Daniel Edmond, Bridget Edmond. (aty,Ledet, Eugene)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Mineral Mountain Trucking Compliance with Removal Order. (aty,Barro, Jose)
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mountain Laurel Assurance Co. (aty,Corry, Michael) Modified on 12/21/2018 to correct filer (Williams, L).
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mountain Laurel Assurance Co.(aty,Corry, Michael) Modified on 12/21/2018 to change filer(Williams, L).
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great West Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp, O R I Great West Holdings Inc for Great West Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Montgomery, Richard) Modified on 12/21/2018 to add corporate parents(Williams, L).
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mark Bundy, Great West Casualty Insurance Co, Mark Bundy Trucking.(aty,Montgomery, Richard)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pico Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Hebert, Tasha)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Albert, Andrea)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mineral Mountain Trucking. (aty,Albert, Andrea)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #11 Answer to Complaint sent to Tasha Warino Hebert on behalf of Pico Inc and Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/26/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eugene English, Pico Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co.(Attorney Tasha Warino Hebert added to party Eugene English(pty:dft), Attorney Tasha Warino Hebert added to party Pico Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Tasha Warino Hebert added to party Scottsdale Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Hebert, Tasha) Modified on 12/11/2018 to add correct filer (Dauterive, C).
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Mountain Laurel Insurance Co. (aty,Corry, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Mark Bundy, Great West Casualty Insurance Co, Mark Bundy Trucking. (aty,Montgomery, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Diaz, James)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.(aty,Diaz, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 1/28/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
December 2, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/2/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/30/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrea Leigh Albert, Jose L Barro, III on behalf of Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Co, Mineral Mountain Trucking. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/14/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 29, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 12th Judicial District Court, Case Number 2018-6089 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3818019) filed by Mineral Mountain Trucking, Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Petition)(Attorney Andrea Leigh Albert added to party Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Leigh Albert added to party Mineral Mountain Trucking(pty:dft))(aty,Albert, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmond et al v. Bundy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edmond
Represented By: Laura B Knoll
Represented By: Wesley K Elmer
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Emily Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Edmond
Represented By: Laura B Knoll
Represented By: Wesley K Elmer
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Emily Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Mountain Trucking
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Represented By: Jose L Barro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelton Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bundy Trucking
Represented By: Richard R Montgomery
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Co
Represented By: Tasha Warino Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene English
Represented By: Tasha Warino Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pico Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Eubanks
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Represented By: Kathryn Troyer Love
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Siefker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bundy
Represented By: Richard R Montgomery
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By: James E Diaz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Co
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Represented By: Kathryn Troyer Love
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Siefker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Jose L Barro, III
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Richard R Montgomery
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Co
Represented By: Tasha Warino Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pico Inc
Represented By: Tasha Warino Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Great West Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?