Craig et al v. Royal et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Craig, Jr., Elisha Lamb and Kevin Craig, Jr
Defendant: Aaron Royal, Great West Casualty Company, ATS Specialized, Inc., A T S Specialized Inc and Great West Casualty Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00028
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/15/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 3/11/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 10, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ATS Specialized, Inc., Great West Casualty Company.(aty,Vasser, Claude)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great West Casualty Company. (aty,Vasser, Claude)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ATS Specialized, Inc.. (aty,Vasser, Claude)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 35th JDC Grant Parish, Case Number 25819 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3847329) filed by Great West Casualty Company, ATS Specialized, Inc., Aaron Royal. (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 Exhibit Request for Notice, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Claude David Vasser, Jr added to party ATS Specialized, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Claude David Vasser, Jr added to party Great West Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Claude David Vasser, Jr added to party Aaron Royal(pty:dft))(aty,Vasser, Claude)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig et al v. Royal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Craig, Jr.
Represented By: Wesley K Elmer
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Emily Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisha Lamb
Represented By: Wesley K Elmer
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Emily Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Craig, Jr
Represented By: Wesley K Elmer
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Emily Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Royal
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATS Specialized, Inc.
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A T S Specialized Inc
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Co
Represented By: Claude David Vasser, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?