Frisby et al v. Shandong Anchi Tyres Co Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Homer J Frisby, Jr, Shane Robert Hankin and Paul Dewayne Siders, Jr
Defendant: Universal Tire & Wheel, Shandong Anchi Tyres Co Ltd and Universal Tire & Wheel Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00076
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint of Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, by Universal Tire & Wheel.(aty,Homza, Brian) Modified on 2/19/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Universal Tire & Wheel.(aty,Homza, Brian) Modified on 2/19/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Tire & Wheel Inc. (aty,Homza, Brian) Modified on 2/6/2019 to edit filer (FinnSld, P).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Intervenor Complaint for twenty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/30/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Amended Complaint, with consent by Universal Tire & Wheel. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Homza, Brian) Modified on 1/29/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/24/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 3/23/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/24/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Universal Tire & Wheel of Clerk's Certificate of filing Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal & Copy of Pet for Removal (Attorney Brian Allen Homza added to party Universal Tire & Wheel(pty:dft)) (aty,Homza, Brian)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Brian Allen Homza on behalf of Universal Tire & Wheel Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/6/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 23, 2019 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 5:19-cv-00076 from Shreveport Division to Alexandria Division. New Case Number 1:19-cv-00076. Attorney picked wrong division when filed. (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 22, 2019 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co against defendants Shandong Anchi Tyres Co Ltd., and Universal Tire & Wheel d/b/a Tire Universe in the 10th JDC, Parish of Natchitoches. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #10 TO DOCUMENT #1 , NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Mitchell, P)
January 22, 2019 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint pursuant to Louisiana Long Arm Statute served on Agent Theodore A. Parker on 5/7/2018 for defendant Shandong Anchi Tyres Co Ltd. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 TO DOCUMENT #1 , NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 22, 2019 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages against Shandong Anchi Tyres Co Ltd, Universal Tire & Wheel d/b/a Tire Universe filed by Homer J Frisby, Jr, Paul Dewayne Siders, Jr, Shane Robert Hankin in the 10th JDC, Parish of Natchitoches. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #9 TO DOCUMENT #1 , NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Mitchell, P) Modified on 1/23/2019 to correct defendant's name. (Mitchell, P)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 10th JDC Natchitoches Parish, Case Number C-90048 B (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3856654) filed by Universal Tire & Wheel Inc. dba Tire Universe. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Attorney Brian Allen Homza added to party Universal Tire & Wheel Inc. dba Tire Universe(pty:selreq))(aty,Homza, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Mitchell, P). Modified on 1/23/2019 to replace civil cover sheet with print buttons.(Mitchell, P) Modified on 2/6/2019 to edit text(FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frisby et al v. Shandong Anchi Tyres Co Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Tire & Wheel
Represented By: Brian Allen Homza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shandong Anchi Tyres Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Tire & Wheel Inc
Represented By: Luke Davis Whetstone
Represented By: Brian Allen Homza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer J Frisby, Jr
Represented By: Michael Joseph Samanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Robert Hankin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Samanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dewayne Siders, Jr
Represented By: Michael Joseph Samanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co
Represented By: Blaine Thomas Aydell
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?