Pierite v. National Liability & Fire Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Florence Pierite
Defendant: National Liability & Fire Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00340
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes by consent sent to counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/10/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes for trial. Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case as presiding judge. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/8/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER OF REFERENCE referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form received 6/4/2019, #2 Consent Form received 7/2/2019)(crt,JonesSld, P)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 2 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 PLAN OF WORK filed by All Parties. Discovery deadline 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2019. Final Date for Expert Employment 11/30/2019. Exchange of Expert Reports due by 11/30/2019. Expert Depositions due by 3/31/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 5/31/2019. See Plan of Work for remainder of deadlines. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Proposed Plan of Work. Pretrial Conference is set for 8/20/2020 at 11:00 AM, in chambers, before Judge Dee D Drell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/4/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/4/2019. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 6/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Counsel shall arrive ten minutes before the status conference to meet with the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/7/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED Plan of Work by National Liability & Fire Insurance Co, Florence Pierite. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rosamond, Samuel) Modified on 5/1/2019 to add filer. (Crick, S).
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by National Liability & Fire Insurance Co . (aty,Rosamond, Samuel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Liability & Fire Insurance Co.(aty,Rosamond, Samuel)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 5/17/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Liability & Fire Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for National Liability & Fire Insurance Co. (aty,Rosamond, Samuel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Samuel M Rosamond, III, Adam Devlin deMahy on behalf of National Liability & Fire Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/1/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 18, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 12th JDC, Parish of Avoyelles. National Liability & Fire Insurance Co answer due 3/25/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 12th JDC Avoyelles Parish, Case Number 19-6384A (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3901951) filed by National Liability & Fire Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, State Court Record)(Attorney Samuel M Rosamond, III added to party National Liability & Fire Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rosamond, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierite v. National Liability & Fire Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Liability & Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: Samuel M Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Pierite
Represented By: Brandon Jude Scott
Represented By: Cory P Roy
Represented By: Benjamin David James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?