Nelson et al v. Upper Iowa University et al
Plaintiff: Darrel Nelson and Ashley Nelson
Defendant: Cynthia Bentley, Upper Iowa University, Tiffany Adams, Kathy Franken, William Duffy and A B C Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2019cv00351
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes by consent sent to counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/25/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes for trial. Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case as presiding judge. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 6/24/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER OF REFERENCE referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form Received on 06/17/2019, #2 Consent Form Received on 06/20/2019)(crt,Crick, S)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 PLAN OF WORK filed by All Parties. Discovery deadline 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/7/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2019. Final Date for Expert Employment 11/19/2019. Exchange of Expert Reports due by 1/18/2020. Expert Depositions due by 2/28/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/17/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #19 Proposed Plan of Work. Pretrial Conference is set for 7/16/2020 at 1:30 PM, in chambers, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/17/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/17/2019. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y)
June 17, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: MOTION HEARING held on 6/17/2019 re #12 MOTION to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kathy Franken, Upper Iowa University, Tiffany Adams, Cynthia Bentley, William Duffy. Matter taken under advisement and a Memorandum Ruling to follow. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A B C Insurance Co (crt,Crick, S)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Joinder; granting #22 Motion to Amend Petition. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 6/11/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 6, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder, Unopposed MOTION to Amend #1 Petition. Motions referred to Judge Dee D Drell. (crt,Crick, S)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder, Unopposed MOTION to Amend #1 Petition by Ashley Nelson, Darrel Nelson. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,White, Laurel) Modified on 6/7/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The Status Conference is set for 6/17/2019 at 1:30 PM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/3/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: as to #12 MOTION to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing (oral argument) is RESET for 6/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/3/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED Plan of Work by Tiffany Adams, Cynthia Bentley, William Duffy, Kathy Franken, Upper Iowa University, Darrel Nelson and Ashley Nelson. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Baer, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2019 to add filers (Dauterive, C).
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: as to #12 MOTION to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing (oral argument) is set for 6/20/2019 at 9:00 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/24/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tiffany Adams, Cynthia Bentley, William Duffy, Kathy Franken, Upper Iowa University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Baer, Andrew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ashley Nelson, Darrel Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents and Authorities)(aty,White, Laurel)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Laurel I. White to Enroll as Counsel for Ashley Nelson and Darrel Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/15/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Laurel I. White to Enroll as Counsel for Ashley Nelson and Darrel Nelson, by Ashley Nelson, Darrel Nelson. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Fuller, Deirdre)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Partially Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tiffany Adams, Cynthia Bentley, William Duffy, Kathy Franken, Upper Iowa University. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Murov, Ellis) Modified on 4/30/2019 to modify motion event to more accurately describe document submitted. (Crick, S).
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO #5 REMOVAL ORDER by Tiffany Adams, Cynthia Bentley, William Duffy, Kathy Franken, Upper Iowa University . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Murov, Ellis) Modified on 4/3/2019 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Petition for Damages by Tiffany Adams, Cynthia Bentley, William Duffy, Kathy Franken, Upper Iowa University.(aty,Murov, Ellis) Modified on 3/26/2019 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal Certain Previously Filed Documents re: #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 3/25/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/21/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 5/18/2019.)(crt,Roaix, G)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Upper Iowa University identifying Corporate Parent Upper Iowa University for Upper Iowa University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(aty,Murov, Ellis)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/20/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document re: Portions of #1 Notice of Removal by Tiffany Adams, Cynthia Bentley, William Duffy, Kathy Franken, Upper Iowa University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Murov, Ellis) Modified on 3/20/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ellis B Murov, Andrew Joseph Baer on behalf of Upper Iowa University. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/3/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 19, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Upper Iowa University answer due 3/26/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Rapides Parish, Case Number 264276-F with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3903609) filed by Kathy Franken, Cynthia Bentley, Upper Iowa University, William Duffy, Tiffany Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Ellis B Murov added to party Tiffany Adams(pty:dft), Attorney Ellis B Murov added to party Cynthia Bentley(pty:dft), Attorney Ellis B Murov added to party William Duffy(pty:dft), Attorney Ellis B Murov added to party Kathy Franken(pty:dft), Attorney Ellis B Murov added to party Upper Iowa University(pty:dft))(aty,Murov, Ellis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Upper Iowa University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Bentley
Represented By: Ellis B Murov
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Iowa University
Represented By: Ellis B Murov
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Adams
Represented By: Ellis B Murov
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Franken
Represented By: Ellis B Murov
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Duffy
Represented By: Ellis B Murov
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Nelson
Represented By: Deirdre R Fuller
Represented By: Laurel I White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nelson
Represented By: Deirdre R Fuller
Represented By: Laurel I White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?