Salim v. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co
Plaintiff: Robert L Salim
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co and Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana
Case Number: 1:2019cv00442
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency to Allison Nunley Pham on behalf of Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co regarding #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw Charles A. O'Brien, III as Attorney. Reason: A motion to withdraw or to substitute counsel must be signed by or have consent of the withdrawing attorney. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Notice of Intent to Dismiss : IT IS ORDERED ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Notice of Intent to Dismissed filed on June 17, 2019 is dismissed as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/3/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENT ? Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw Charles A. O'Brien, III as Attorney by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pham, Allison) Modified on 7/9/2019 to remove additional motion event and reflect deficient status (Dauterive, C).
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with consent sought but not yet obtained by Robert L Salim. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Corkern, Ronald)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co.(aty,O'Brien, Charles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 3, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co answer due 4/15/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf, Attachment #1 to #6 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, in globo)(aty,Pham, Allison)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/11/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/10/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co. (aty,Pham, Allison)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 10th JDC Natchitoches Parish, Case Number 90,952 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3920084) filed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Attorney Allison Nunley Pham added to party Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Pham, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salim v. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Co
Represented By: Allison Nunley Pham
Represented By: Charles A O'Brien, III
Represented By: Jessica Wainwright Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Salim
Represented By: Ronald E Corkern, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?